US SB1086 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
International Insurance Capital Standards Accountability Act of 2015 This bill establishes at the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System the Insurance Policy Advisory Committee on International Capital Standards and Other Insurance Issues, a 21-member committee representing diverse expert perspectives from the U.S. insurance industry (including life insurance, property and casualty insurance and reinsurance, agents and brokers, academics, consumer advocates, or experts on issues facing underserved insurance communities and consumers). The Secretary of the Treasury and the Board Chairman shall report annually to certain congressional committees on their efforts with the National Association of Insurance Commissioners regarding global insurance regulatory or supervisory forums. The Secretary, the Board Chairman, and the Director of the Federal Insurance Office, before supporting or consenting to the adoption of any key element in any international insurance proposal or international insurance capital standard, must study its impact upon U.S. markets and consumers. The Secretary and the Board Chairman must also report, as well as testify to Congress on their efforts to increase transparency at meetings of the International Association of Insurance Supervisors.
Title
International Insurance Capital Standards Accountability Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1910 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
SB2132 (Related) 2015-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
SB2132 (Related) 2015-10-06 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Insurance industry and regulation
International organizations and cooperation
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Reserve System
Finance and financial sector
Insurance industry and regulation
International organizations and cooperation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/1086/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s1086/BILLS-114s1086is.pdf |