US SB1085 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Military and Veteran Caregiver Services Improvement Act of 2015 Expands eligibility for the family caregiver program of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to include members of the Armed Forces or veterans who are seriously injured or who became ill on active duty prior to September 11, 2001 (currently, limited to service after September 11, 2001). Expands services to caregivers of veterans under such program to include child care services, financial planning services, and legal services. Terminates the support program for caregivers of covered veterans on October 1, 2020, except that any caregiver activities carried out on September 30, 2020, shall be continued on and after October 1, 2020. Authorizes the transfer of entitlement to post 9/11 education assistance to family members by veterans who are retired for a physical disability or who are seriously injured veterans in need of family caregiver services, without regard to length-of-service requirements. Authorizes the VA Secretary to pay monthly special compensation to seriously injured or ill veterans in need of personal care services and to their caregivers. Authorizes flexible work schedules or telework for federal employees who are caregivers of veterans. Amends the Public Health Service Act to designate a veteran participating in the program of comprehensive assistance for family caregivers as an adult with a special need for purposes of the lifespan respite care program. Establishes in the executive branch an interagency working group to review and report on policies relating to the caregivers of veterans and members of the Armed Forces. Directs the Secretary to provide for studies on members of the Armed Forces who commenced service after September 11, 2001, and veterans who have incurred a serious injury or illness, including a mental health injury, and their caregivers.
Title
Military and Veteran Caregiver Services Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1969 (Related) 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Child care and development
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Employee leave
Executive agency funding and structure
Financial services and investments
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Lawyers and legal services
Mental health
Military personnel and dependents
Neurological disorders
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
Child care and development
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Employee leave
Executive agency funding and structure
Financial services and investments
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Lawyers and legal services
Mental health
Military personnel and dependents
Neurological disorders
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/1085/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s1085/BILLS-114s1085is.pdf |