US SB1083 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Drug Savings Act of 2015 Amends part D (Voluntary Prescription Drug Benefit Program) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act (SSAct) to require drug manufacturers to pay the Secretary of Health and Human Services drug rebates for rebate eligible (low-income) individuals. Excludes from Medicare coverage as a part D drug any drug or biological manufactured by a manufacturer that has not entered into and have in effect a rebate agreement with the Secretary. Requires a rebate agreement to require a drug or biological manufacturer to provide to the Secretary a rebate, determined according to a specified formula, for each rebate period ending after December 31, 2015, for any covered Medicare part D drug dispensed after that date to any rebate eligible individual for which payment was made by a prescription drug plan sponsor or MedicareAdvantage organization for such period. Specifies a formula for determination of Medicaid rebate amounts for such drugs or biologicals. Amends SSAct title XIX (Medicaid) to exclude any amounts paid under a rebate agreement from the determination of best price and average manufacturer price under the Medicaid program.
Title
Medicare Drug Savings Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2005 (Same As) 2015-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3513 (Related) 2015-09-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2023 (Related) 2015-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3513 (Related) 2015-09-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2023 (Related) 2015-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Medicaid
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
Health care costs and insurance
Medicaid
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/1083/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s1083/BILLS-114s1083is.pdf |