US SB1044 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Became Public Law No: 113-123.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Became Public Law No: 113-123.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
World War II Memorial Prayer Act of 2013 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to install at the World War II memorial in the District of Columbia a suitable plaque or an inscription with the words that President Franklin D. Roosevelt prayed with the United States on June 6, 1944, the morning of D-Day. Bars the use of federal funds for the preparation or installation of the plaque or inscription, but permits the acceptance and expenditure of private contributions for such purpose. Makes the Commemorative Works Act applicable to the design and placement of the plaque within the area of the World War II Memorial.
Title
World War II Memorial Prayer Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 370 N: 12 NV: 49 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-123. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 370 - 12 (Roll no. 339). (text: CR H5607) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5610-5611) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1044. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5607-5608) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Mr. Hastings (WA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Held at the desk. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3461-3464; text as passed Senate: CR S3461-3462) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 339. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Landrieu without amendment. With written report No. 113-141. |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-93. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2175 (Same As) 2014-06-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 373.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
District of Columbia
Europe
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers
Public lands and natural resources
Religion
U.S. history
District of Columbia
Europe
Military history
Monuments and memorials
Presidents and presidential powers
Public lands and natural resources
Religion
U.S. history