US SB1039 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Addresses disability compensation and care issues for Persian Gulf War veterans. First, the bill expands eligibility for disability compensation from the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to Persian Gulf War veterans who have a qualifying chronic disability that became manifest to any degree at any time. Next, the VA must develop a Disability Benefits Questionnaire to be used by health care personnel to identify Gulf War illness if a Persian Gulf veteran presents with any one symptom associated with such illness. The bill also expands who qualifies as a Persian Gulf veteran by including those who served in Afghanistan, Israel, Egypt, Turkey, Syria, or Jordan during the Persian Gulf War. Under current law, Persian Gulf veteran refers only to individuals who served on active duty during the Persian Gulf War in particular areas of the Arabian Peninsula. Finally, the VA must ensure its health care personnel are appropriately trained to provide care to Persian Gulf veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve compensation for disabilities occurring in Persian Gulf War veterans, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
2021-03-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB3967 (Related) 2022-06-16 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR950 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback