US SB1031 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 19 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-11-19 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to conduct a study to assess whether there are disparities associated with race and ethnicity with respect to (1) compensation benefits administered by the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), (2) disability ratings determined by the VA, and (3) the rejection of fully developed claims for VA benefits. The GAO must also develop recommendations to facilitate better data collection on such disparities associated with race and ethnicity. Within one year, the GAO must brief Congress on the initial results of the study. The GAO must also submit a final report on the study following the briefing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to require the Comptroller General of the United States to conduct a study on disparities associated with race and ethnicity with respect to certain benefits administered by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-19SenatePresented to President.
2021-11-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-11-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
2021-11-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1031.
2021-11-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6251-6252)
2021-11-15HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-08-10HouseHeld at the desk.
2021-08-10HouseReceived in the House.
2021-08-09SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2021-08-06SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5990)
2021-08-06SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5990)
2021-05-26SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-04-28SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
2021-03-25SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB3856 (Related) 2021-09-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback