US SB1023 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 2 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-02 - Presented to President.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tropical Forest Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2018 This bill renames the Tropical Forest Conservation Act of 1998 as the Tropical Forest Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2017. Non-tropical forests and coral reef ecosystems are included within the scope of, and made eligible for benefits under, the Tropical Forest Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2017. The Tropical Forest Facility is renamed the Conservation Facility. One or more individuals appointed by the U.S. government may serve on oversight bodies for grants from a debt-for-nature swap or debt buyback regardless of whether the United States is a party to any agreement between the eligible purchaser and the government of the beneficiary country. The Tropical Forest Fund is renamed the Conservation Fund. A grant of more than $250,000 from a fund must be approved by the U.S. government and the government of the beneficiary country. The Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 is amended to revise International Monetary Fund criteria for country eligibility.
Title
Tropical Forest Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-21 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 488 (Y: 332 N: 43 NV: 57 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 332 - 43 (Roll no. 488). (text: CR H10544-10545) |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10574) |
2018-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1023. |
2018-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10544-10546) |
2018-12-21 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-12-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-20 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S7950-7953) |
2018-12-20 | Senate | The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.4174 Amendment SA 4174 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.4174 Amendment SA 4174 proposed by Senator Boozman for Senator Portman. (consideration: CR S7870-7871; text: CR S7871-7878) To modify the authorization of appropriations. |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7950-7951) |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 544. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6982 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Forests, forestry, trees
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Forests, forestry, trees
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection