US SB101 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Declares that the boundary of Acadia National Park in Maine is confirmed to include approximately 1,441 acres of land and interests in the Schoodic Peninsula. The bill ratifies and approves the acquisition by the United States of such land and interests, effective as of September 26, 2013, and any alteration of such land or interests held or claimed by the United State that occurred after such date. The Department of the Interior may make certain technical and limited revisions to the permanent boundaries of the park. Interior shall reestablish and appoint members to the Acadia National Park Advisory Commission. Certain land in the park that was conveyed by Interior to the town of Tremont, Maine, shall no longer be used exclusively for school purposes, but for public purposes, subject to specified conditions. Interior shall allow for the traditional taking of marine species, marine worms, and shellfish on land within the park between the mean high watermark and the mean low watermark in accordance with the laws of the State of Maine. Interior shall convey to the town of Bar Harbor a specified parcel of land within the park to be used for a solid waste transfer facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Acadia National Park Boundary Clarification Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-10SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HB459 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback