US HR983 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the importance of Tribal colleges and universities to the United States and expressing support for designating the week beginning March 13, 2022, as National Tribal Colleges and Universities Week.
Title
Recognizing the importance of Tribal colleges and universities to the United States and expressing support for designating the week beginning March 13, 2022, as National Tribal Colleges and Universities Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] |
Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] |
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] |
Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR173 (Related) 2021-02-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR94 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1022; text: CR S1034)
SR545 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1155; text: CR S1155)
SR94 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1022; text: CR S1034)
SR545 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1155; text: CR S1155)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/983/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres983/BILLS-117hres983ih.pdf |