US HR921 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5711) to prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from authorizing certain transactions by a U.S. financial institution in connection with the export or re-export of a commercial passenger aircraft to the Islamic Republic of Iran; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5982) to amend chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, to provide for en bloc consideration in resolutions of disapproval for "midnight rules", and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from November 18, 2016, through November 28, 2016. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5711) to prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from authorizing certain transactions by a U.S. financial institution in connection with the export or re-export of a commercial passenger aircraft to the Islamic Republic of Iran; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5982) to amend chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, to provide for en bloc consideration in resolutions of disapproval for "midnight rules", and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from November 18, 2016, through November 28, 2016.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5711) to prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from authorizing certain transactions by a U.S. financial institution in connection with the export or re-export of a commercial passenger aircraft to the Islamic Republic of Iran; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5982) to amend chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, to provide for en bloc consideration in resolutions of disapproval for "midnight rules", and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from November 18, 2016, through November 28, 2016.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-16 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 231 N: 181 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 231 N: 181 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 231 N: 181 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 231 N: 181 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 231 N: 181 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-11-16 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 181 (Roll no. 580). (text: CR H6249) |
2016-11-16 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 181 (Roll no. 579). (consideration: CR H6255) |
2016-11-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6254-6255) |
2016-11-16 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Res. 921, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote, announced that the yeas had prevailed. Ms. Slaughter demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on ordering the previous question until a time to be announced. |
2016-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 921. |
2016-11-16 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H6248-6254) |
2016-11-14 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 156. |
2016-11-14 | House | The rule provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 5711 and H.R. 5982. |
2016-11-14 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-818, by Mr. Collins (GA). |