US HR893 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-11-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating November 2023 as "National Homeless Children and Youth Awareness Month".
Title
Designating November 2023 as "National Homeless Children and Youth Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] |
Rep. Morgan McGarvey [D-KY] | Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO] | Rep. Yadira Caraveo [D-CO] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Jared Moskowitz [D-FL] | Rep. Kevin Mullin [D-CA] |
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Delia Ramirez [D-IL] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Hillary Scholten [D-MI] |
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Jill Tokuda [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR479 (Related) 2023-11-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5676; text: CR S5677)
HR1598 (Same As) 2024-11-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SR920 (Related) 2024-12-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6789; text: CR S6782-6783)
HR1598 (Same As) 2024-11-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SR920 (Related) 2024-12-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6789; text: CR S6782-6783)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/893/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres893/BILLS-118hres893ih.pdf |