US HR840 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of the week of April 29, 2018, through May 5, 2018, as "National Small Business Week" to celebrate the contributions of small businesses and entrepreneurs in every community in the United States. Celebrates the contributions of small businesses and entrepreneurs in every U.S. community. Supports the designation of National Small Business Week. Recognizes the importance of creating policies that promote an environment in which small businesses may succeed. Supports efforts to: (1) encourage consumers to utilize small businesses, and (2) increase awareness of the value of small businesses and their impact on the U.S. economy.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the week of April 29, 2018, through May 5, 2018, as "National Small Business Week" to celebrate the contributions of small businesses and entrepreneurs in every community in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] |
Rep. Dave Brat [R-VA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. James Comer [R-KY] |
Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] |
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] |
Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2018-04-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR288 (Same As) 2017-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/840/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres840/BILLS-115hres840ih.pdf |