US HR84 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for designation of February 4, 2017, as National Cancer Prevention Day. Expresses support for the designation of National Cancer Prevention Day.
Title
Expressing support for designation of February 4, 2017, as National Cancer Prevention Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] |
Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR721 (Related) 2018-02-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/84/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres84/BILLS-115hres84ih.pdf |