US HR817 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing continued support for the special relationship between the United States and the United Kingdom and urging commencement of negotiations for the development of a North Atlantic Trade and Investment Partnership (NATIP) between the United States and the United Kingdom. Reaffirms the special relationship between the United States and the United Kingdom. Expresses respect for the decision of the June 23, 2016, referendum to leave the European Union and recognizes that it will not diminish the bond between the governments and people of the United States and the United Kingdom. Supports bilateral and free trade discussions between the two countries. Instructs the U.S. Trade Representative to begin negotiations with the United Kingdom for a new U.S.-United Kingdom North Atlantic Trade and Investment Partnership.
Title
Expressing continued support for the special relationship between the United States and the United Kingdom and urging commencement of negotiations for the development of a North Atlantic Trade and Investment Partnership (NATIP) between the United States and the United Kingdom.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Ryan Zinke [R-MT] |
Rep. Rod Blum [R-IA] | Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
Rep. David Young [R-IA] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
Rep. Cresent Hardy [R-NV] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] |
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade. |
2016-09-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats. |
2016-07-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2016-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2016-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/817/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres817/BILLS-114hres817ih.pdf |