US HR811 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4790) to amend the Volcker rule to give the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System sole rulemaking authority, to exclude community banks from the requirements of the Volcker rule, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4790) to amend the Volcker rule to give the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System sole rulemaking authority, to exclude community banks from the requirements of the Volcker rule, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4790) to amend the Volcker rule to give the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System sole rulemaking authority, to exclude community banks from the requirements of the Volcker rule, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 133 (Y: 231 N: 186 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 134 (Y: 230 N: 184 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 134 (Y: 230 N: 184 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-11 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 230 - 184 (Roll no. 134). (text: CR H3105) |
2018-04-11 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 186 (Roll no. 133). (consideration: CR H3110-3111) |
2018-04-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3110-3112) |
2018-04-11 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 811, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. McGovern demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of ordering the previous question until later in the legislative day. |
2018-04-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 811. |
2018-04-11 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H3105-3110) |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 137. |
2018-04-10 | House | Also, the rule provides for motions to suspend the rules relating to H.J. Res. 2 on the legislative day of April 12, 2018. |
2018-04-10 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-629, by Mr. Buck. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4790 (Related) 2018-04-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HR811 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR811 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.