US HR806 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the goals and ideals of "Financial Literacy Month".
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of "Financial Literacy Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2018-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR243 (Related) 2017-04-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR145 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2631; text of measure as introduced: CR S2627-2628)
SR490 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2498; text: CR S2492-2493)
SR145 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2631; text of measure as introduced: CR S2627-2628)
SR490 (Related) 2018-04-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2498; text: CR S2492-2493)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/806/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres806/BILLS-115hres806ih.pdf |