US HR79 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 514) to extend expiring provisions of the USA PATRIOT Improvement and Reauthorization Act of 2005 and Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004 relating to access to business records, individual terrorists as agents of foreign powers, and roving wiretaps until December 8, 2011.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 514) to extend expiring provisions of the USA PATRIOT Improvement and Reauthorization Act of 2005 and Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004 relating to access to business records, individual terrorists as agents of foreign powers, and roving wiretaps until December 8, 2011.
Sponsors
Rep. David Dreier [R-CA] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-10 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 248 N: 176 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-02-10 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 248 - 176 (Roll no. 29). (text: CR H621) |
2011-02-10 | House | The previous question was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H630) |
2011-02-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 79. |
2011-02-10 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H621-631) |
2011-02-09 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 8. |
2011-02-09 | House | All points of order against provisions in the bill are waived. |
2011-02-09 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 112-8, by Mr. Dreier. |
Same As/Similar To
HB514 (Related) 2011-02-25 - Became Public Law No: 112-3.