US HR780 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-21 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1632)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-21 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1632)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the goals and ideals of the Olympic movement. Congratulates the U.S. Olympic Committee and the U.S. Olympic and Paralympic teams for their accomplishments during the 2012 Olympic and Paralympic Games in London, England.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of the Olympic movement.
Sponsors
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] |
Rep. Jon Runyan [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-21 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1632) |
2012-09-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SR558 (Related) 2012-09-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/21/2012 S6678)
Subjects
Athletes
Congressional tributes
Disability and paralysis
Europe
International affairs
Olympic games
United Kingdom
Congressional tributes
Disability and paralysis
Europe
International affairs
Olympic games
United Kingdom
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-resolution/780/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hres780/BILLS-112hres780ih.pdf |