US HR714 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-03 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-03 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reaffirms U.S. support for the peaceful resolution of maritime territorial disputes in the South China Sea and the East China Sea. Reaffirms support for freedom of navigation and overflight and condemns coercive actions or the use of force to impede these freedoms in international maritime domains and airspace. Declares that the House of Representatives does not recognize the East China Sea Air Defense Identification Zone, declared by china, which is contrary to freedom of overflight in international airspace. Calls on China to refrain from taking similar provocative actions elsewhere in the Asia-Pacific region, including in the South China Sea. Urges the Association of Southeast Asian Nations (ASEAN), U.S. allies and partners, and all claimants to fairly resolve these outstanding disputes, including through the conclusion of a Code of Conduct for the South China Sea. Urges as well the conclusion of the annex to the non-binding memorandum of understanding between the United States and China on "rules of behavior for safety of air and maritime encounters" addressing air-to-air encounters in 2015. Supports continued U.S. operations to support freedom of navigation in international waters and air space in the South China Sea and the East China Sea. Encourages continued U.S. efforts to strengthen regional partnerships to build capacity for maritime domain awareness in support of freedom of navigation, maintenance of peace and stability, and respect for principles of international law.
Title
To reaffirm the strong support of the United States Government for the peaceful and collaborative resolution of maritime and jurisdictional disputes in the South China Sea and the East China Sea as provided for by universally recognized principles of international law, and to reaffirm the vital interest of the United States in freedom of navigation and other internationally lawful uses of sea and airspace in the Asia-Pacific region.
Sponsors
Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Stockman [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8350-8351) |
2014-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 714. |
2014-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8350-8354) |
2014-12-03 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2014-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-09-17 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent . |
2014-09-17 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2014-09-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2014-09-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Subjects
ASEAN countries
Asia
Aviation and airports
China
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Pacific Ocean
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Asia
Aviation and airports
China
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Pacific Ocean
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status