US HR706 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4901) to reauthorize the Scholarships for Opportunity and Results Act, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 88) disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to the definition of the term "Fiduciary"; and providing for proceedings during the period from May 2, 2016, through May 9, 2016. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4901) to reauthorize the Scholarships for Opportunity and Results Act, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 88) disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to the definition of the term "Fiduciary"; and providing for proceedings during the period from May 2, 2016, through May 9, 2016.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 4901) to reauthorize the Scholarships for Opportunity and Results Act, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 88) disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to the definition of the term "Fiduciary"; and providing for proceedings during the period from May 2, 2016, through May 9, 2016.
Sponsors
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 234 N: 183 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 231 N: 182 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 231 N: 182 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-28 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 234 - 183 (Roll no. 174). (text: CR H2076) |
2016-04-28 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 182 (Roll no. 173). (consideration: CR H2080) |
2016-04-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 706. |
2016-04-28 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2076-2081) |
2016-04-27 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 110. |
2016-04-27 | House | Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4901 and H.J. Res. 88. |
2016-04-27 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-533, by Ms. Foxx. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR88 (Related) 2016-06-22 - Motion to refer the bill and accompanying veto message to the Committee on Education and the Workforce. The Chair directed the Clerk to notify the Senate of the action of the House.
HB4901 (Related) 2016-07-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
HB4901 (Related) 2016-07-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.