US HR672 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the Three Seas Initiative in its efforts to (1) increase energy resilience and infrastructure connectivity across Central and Eastern Europe; and (2) further the process of building a Europe that is undivided, secure, prosperous, and free.
Title
Expressing support of the Three Seas Initiative in its efforts to increase energy independence and infrastructure connectivity thereby strengthening the United States and European national security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5902-5903) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 672. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5902-5904) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Espaillat moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2020-10-01 | House | Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment Discharged. |
2020-10-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, Energy and the Environment. |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-10-31 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H8707) |
2019-10-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Business investment and capital
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic performance and conditions
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
International organizations and cooperation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Business investment and capital
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic performance and conditions
Energy
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
International organizations and cooperation
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status