US HR667 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 1) to provide for reconciliation pursuant to titles II and V of the concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 2018; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3312) to amend the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to specify when bank holding companies may be subject to certain enhanced supervision, and for other purposes; and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 1) to provide for reconciliation pursuant to titles II and V of the concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 2018; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3312) to amend the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to specify when bank holding companies may be subject to certain enhanced supervision, and for other purposes.
Title
Providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 1) to provide for reconciliation pursuant to titles II and V of the concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 2018; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3312) to amend the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act to specify when bank holding companies may be subject to certain enhanced supervision, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-19 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 688 (Y: 233 N: 187 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-19 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 689 (Y: 233 N: 193 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-19 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 689 (Y: 233 N: 193 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-19 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 233 - 193 (Roll no. 689). (text: CR H10189-10190) |
2017-12-19 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 187 (Roll no. 688). |
2017-12-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 667. |
2017-12-19 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H10189-10200) |
2017-12-18 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of the conference report to accompany H.R. 1. Additionally, the resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 3312, under a closed rule. The rule provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on both the conference report and H.R. 3312. Lastly, the rule provides for motions to suspend the rules through the remainder of the first session of the 115th Congress. |
2017-12-18 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 111. |
2017-12-18 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-474, by Mr. Sessions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2017-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-97. (TXT | PDF)
HB3312 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3312 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.