US HR662 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring the victims resulting from hate crimes, Islamophobia and anti-immigrant sentiment, in the aftermath of September 11, 2001, where individuals were targeted by violence and hatred because they were Muslim or perceived to be Muslim.
Title
Honoring the victims resulting from hate crimes, Islamophobia and anti-immigrant sentiment, in the aftermath of September 11, 2001, where individuals were targeted by violence and hatred because they were Muslim or perceived to be Muslim.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2022-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-09-21 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1004) |
2021-09-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-09-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/662/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres662/BILLS-117hres662ih.pdf |