US HR650 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the safety and security of the Iranian dissidents living in Camp Liberty/Hurriya in Iraq and awaiting resettlement by the United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees, and permitting use of their own assets to assist in their resettlement. Condemns the attacks against the residents of Camp Liberty/Hurriya in Iraq. Urges the government of Iraq to: (1) bring to justice those responsible for the attacks; and (2) ensure access to food, clean water, medical assistance, electricity and other necessary supplies and equipment. Calls on the United States to work with Iraq to: (1) bring Camp Liberty/Hurriya to the same level of protection as that of the Baghdad International Airport to ensure the security of the residents, and (2) facilitate the residents' ability to sell their property and assets in order to fund their costs of living and resettlement out of Iraq. Urges the United States to work with Iraq and the United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees (UNHCR) to ensure that Camp Liberty/Hurriya residents, without exception, are safely resettled outside of Iraq and Iran according to the terms of the December 2011 Memorandum of Understanding. Calls on the United States to work with Albania and UNHCR to provide suitable housing for the remaining Camp Liberty/Hurriya residents in Albania.
Title
Providing for the safety and security of the Iranian dissidents living in Camp Liberty/Hurriya in Iraq and awaiting resettlement by the United Nations High Commissioner for Refugees, and permitting use of their own assets to assist in their resettlement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-05-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-05-11 | House | Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa Discharged. |
2016-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa. |
2016-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2016-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Albania
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
Iran
Iraq
Middle East
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Terrorism
United Nations
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
Iran
Iraq
Middle East
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Terrorism
United Nations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/650/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres650/BILLS-114hres650ih.pdf |