US HR643 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5326) making appropriations for the Departments of Commerce and Justice, Science, and Related Agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2013, and for other purposes; waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 5326) making appropriations for the Departments of Commerce and Justice, Science, and Related Agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2013, and for other purposes; waiving a requirement of clause 6(a) of rule XIII with respect to consideration of certain resolutions reported from the Committee on Rules; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 228 N: 181 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 235 N: 174 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 228 N: 181 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 235 N: 174 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 235 N: 174 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 228 N: 181 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 235 N: 174 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-05-08 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 228 - 181 (Roll no. 200). (text: CR H2337) |
2012-05-08 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 235 - 174 (Roll no. 199). (consideration: CR H2344-2345) |
2012-05-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 643. |
2012-05-08 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H2337-2346) |
2012-05-07 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 129. |
2012-05-07 | House | All points of order against provisions in the bill for failure to comply with clause 2 of rule XXI are waived. Until the adoption of a conference report on the budget resolution, the allocations of spending authority printed in Tables 11 and 12 of the Budget Committee report accompanying the House-passed budget resolution shall be considered to be the allocations under section 302(a) of the Congressional Budget Act of 1974. The Chair is authorized to accord priority in recognition to Members who have pre-printed their amendments in the Congressional Record. The rule waives clause 6(a) of rule XIII (two-thirds vote requirement) against any resolution from the Rules Committee reported on May 10, 2012 for consideration or disposition of any measure reported by the Committee on the Budget relating to section 201 of H. Con. Res. 112. |
2012-05-07 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 112-464, by Mr. Woodall. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5326 (Related) 2012-05-14 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 397.