US HR610 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the designation of National Urban Wildlife Refuge Day. The resolution also affirms support for the Urban Wildlife Conservation Program within the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of September 29, 2019, as National Urban Wildlife Refuge Day.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-09-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-09-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR1123 (Same As) 2020-09-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/610/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres610/BILLS-116hres610ih.pdf |