US HR577 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 469) to impose certain limitations on consent decrees and settlement agreements by agencies that require the agencies to take regulatory action in accordance with the terms thereof, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 732) to limit donations made pursuant to settlement agreements to which the United States is a party, and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 469) to impose certain limitations on consent decrees and settlement agreements by agencies that require the agencies to take regulatory action in accordance with the terms thereof, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 732) to limit donations made pursuant to settlement agreements to which the United States is a party.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 469) to impose certain limitations on consent decrees and settlement agreements by agencies that require the agencies to take regulatory action in accordance with the terms thereof, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 732) to limit donations made pursuant to settlement agreements to which the United States is a party, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-24 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 572 (Y: 228 N: 189 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 573 (Y: 227 N: 190 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-10-24HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 227 - 190 (Roll no. 573). (text: CR H8086-8087)
2017-10-24HouseOn ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 189 (Roll no. 572). (consideration: CR H8095; text: CR H8095)
2017-10-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 577.
2017-10-24HouseConsidered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H8086-8096)
2017-10-23HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 92.
2017-10-23HouseRule provides for one hour of general debate for H.R. 469. The rule also provides for consideration of amendments printed in part A of the report. The rule provides for one hour of general debate for H.R. 732. The rule provides for consideration of amendments printe in part B of the report.
2017-10-23HouseThe House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-363, by Mr. Collins (GA).

Same As/Similar To

HB469 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR577 (Similar To) 2017-10-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB732 (Related) 2017-10-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback