US HR57 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-15)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H828)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H828)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the contributions of Catholic schools. Expresses support for: (1) the goals of Catholic Schools Week, an event cosponsored by the National Catholic Educational Association and the United States Conference of Catholic Bishops and established to recognize the contributions of Catholic elementary and secondary schools in the United States; and (2) the continued dedication of Catholic schools, students, parents, and teachers toward academic excellence and the key role they play in promoting and ensuring a brighter, stronger future for the nation.
Title
Supporting the contributions of Catholic schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] |
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] |
Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] |
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H828) |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR47 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
HR692 (Related) 2018-02-02 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E129)
SR382 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S526; text: CR S524-525)
HR692 (Related) 2018-02-02 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E129)
SR382 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S526; text: CR S524-525)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Religion
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Religion
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/57/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres57/BILLS-115hres57ih.pdf |