US HR550 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the Day of the African Child. Salutes the health professionals and community health workers in Africa who are extending health care and hope to families across the continent. Reaffirms the importance of U.S. partnership with African leaders and communities in reducing child, newborn, and maternal deaths.
Title
Recognizing the "Day of the African Child" on June 16, 2009, devoted to the theme of child survival and to emphasize the importance of reducing maternal, newborn, and child deaths in Africa.
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Berman [D-CA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] |
Rep. Anh Cao [R-LA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. Chaka Fattah [D-PA] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Bob Inglis [R-SC] | Rep. Jesse Jackson [D-IL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Carolyn Kilpatrick [D-MI] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
Rep. Brad Miller [D-NC] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Fortney Stark [D-CA] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] |
Rep. Diane Watson [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Wexler [D-FL] | Rep. Lynn Woolsey [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-30 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-07-30 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 7/28/2009 H8941) | |
2009-07-30 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9166) | |
2009-07-28 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 550. | |
2009-07-28 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8941-8943) | |
2009-07-28 | Mr. Faleomavaega moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-06-16 | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Subjects
Africa
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Foreign aid and international relief
Health personnel
International affairs
Sex and reproductive health
Women's health
World health
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Foreign aid and international relief
Health personnel
International affairs
Sex and reproductive health
Women's health
World health