US HR53 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Condemning the cowardly attack on innocent men, women, and children in the northeastern Nigerian town of Baga. Supports the people of Nigeria, especially the men, women, and children in the northeastern Nigerian town of Baga who were victimized, trafficked, and murdered by the terrorist group Boko Haram. Condemns Boko Haram for its violent attacks on civilian targets in Nigeria. Encourages the government of Nigeria to: (1) strengthen efforts to protect civilians from Boko Haram; and (2) work with the United States and other governments such as Chad, Niger, and Cameroon to defeat Boko Haram. Supports U.S. offers of assistance to Nigeria in the search for the school girls abducted by Boko Haram.
Title
Condemning the cowardly attack on innocent men, women, and children in the northeastern Nigerian town of Baga.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2015-03-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-03-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1829) |
2015-03-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 53. |
2015-03-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1829-1832) |
2015-03-23 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2015-02-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-02-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-02-25 | House | Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations Discharged. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Africa
Cameroon
Chad
Conflicts and wars
Crimes against children
Human rights
Human trafficking
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Niger
Nigeria
Terrorism
Violent crime
Cameroon
Chad
Conflicts and wars
Crimes against children
Human rights
Human trafficking
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Niger
Nigeria
Terrorism
Violent crime