US HR526 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-11)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supports: (1) strengthened U.S. engagements with Georgia aimed at helping Georgia enhance its security and to restore its territorial integrity through exclusively peaceful means, (2) implementation of the United States-Georgia Charter on Strategic Partnership, and (3) Georgia's North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) membership aspirations. Affirms that it is U.S. policy to support Georgia's sovereignty, independence, and territorial integrity and to recognize Abkhazia and South Ossetia as regions of Georgia illegally occupied by the Russian Federation. Calls on: (1) the Russian Federation to end the occupation of Abkhazia and South Ossetia and withdraw its troops from the internationally recognized border of Georgia; and (2) the Russian Federation, Venezuela, Nicaragua, Tuvalu, and Nauru to reverse their recognition of Abkhazia and South Ossetia as independent. Urges Russia and the authorities in control in the regions to allow for the return of internally displaced persons and for international mission access to the regions of Abkhazia and South Ossetia. Encourages Georgia to: (1) continue strengthening its democracy; and (2) preserve cultural heritage, language, and ethnic identity aimed at reconciling divided communities of the Georgian regions of Abkhazia and South Ossetia. Affirms that a peaceful resolution to this conflict is a U.S. priority in the Caucasus region.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives with respect toward the establishment of a democratic and prosperous Republic of Georgia and the establishment of a peaceful and just resolution to the conflict with Georgia's internationally recognized borders.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] | Rep. Todd Akin [R-MO] | Rep. Ann Buerkle [R-NY] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Robert Dold [R-IL] | Rep. David Dreier [R-CA] |
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Jo Emerson [R-MO] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. Benjamin Quayle [R-AZ] | Rep. David Rivera [R-FL] | Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] | Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. Jean Schmidt [R-OH] | Rep. Allyson Schwartz [D-PA] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Allen West [R-FL] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6083-6084) |
2012-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 526. |
2012-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6083-6086) |
2012-09-19 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2012-06-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2012-06-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-04-26 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Unanimous Consent . |
2012-04-26 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2012-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe and Eurasia. |
2012-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Subjects
Alliances
Conflicts and wars
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Georgia (Republic)
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Nauru
News media and reporting
Nicaragua
Oceania
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Venezuela
Conflicts and wars
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Europe
Georgia (Republic)
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Nauru
News media and reporting
Nicaragua
Oceania
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Venezuela