US HR513 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3697) to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act with respect to aliens associated with criminal gangs, and for other purposes, and providing for proceedings during the period from September 15, 2017, through September 22, 2017. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3697) to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act with respect to aliens associated with criminal gangs, and for other purposes, and providing for proceedings during the period from September 15, 2017, through September 22, 2017.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3697) to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act with respect to aliens associated with criminal gangs, and for other purposes, and providing for proceedings during the period from September 15, 2017, through September 22, 2017.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 486 (Y: 222 N: 184 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 487 (Y: 222 N: 186 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 487 (Y: 222 N: 186 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-13 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 222 - 186 (Roll no. 487). (text: CR H7325) |
2017-09-13 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 184 (Roll no. 486). (consideration: CR H7332-7333) |
2017-09-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 513. |
2017-09-13 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H7325-7334) |
2017-09-12 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 83. |
2017-09-12 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3697 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. |
2017-09-12 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-307, by Mr. Collins (GA). |
Same As/Similar To
HB3697 (Related) 2017-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR513 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR513 (Similar To) 2017-09-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.