US HR510 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the designation of the week beginning November 8, 2015, as "National Pregnancy Center Week" to recognize the vital role that pregnancy care and resource centers play in saving lives and serving women and men faced with difficult pregnancy decisions. Expresses support for the designation of National Pregnancy Center Week and the work of pregnancy care and resource centers. Recognizes the importance of protecting life and assisting women and men in need as they bring children into the world.
Title
Supporting the designation of the week beginning November 8, 2015, as "National Pregnancy Center Week" to recognize the vital role that pregnancy care and resource centers play in saving lives and serving women and men faced with difficult pregnancy decisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS] | Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] |
Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] |
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] |
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] |
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-11-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-11-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR312 (Related) 2015-11-10 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7917)
Subjects
Abortion
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Women's health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-resolution/510/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hres510/BILLS-114hres510ih.pdf |