US HR478 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for further consideration of the bill (H.B. 3219) making appropriations for the Department of Defense for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2018, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules. Sets forth the rule for consideration of H.B. 3219 (Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2018).
Title
Providing for further consideration of the bill (H.B. 3219) making appropriations for the Department of Defense for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2018, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-27 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 426 (Y: 233 N: 185 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 427 (Y: 230 N: 196 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 427 (Y: 230 N: 196 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-27 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 230 - 196 (Roll no. 427). (text: CR H6481) |
2017-07-27 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 233 - 185 (Roll no. 426). (consideration: CR H6490) |
2017-07-27 | House | DEBATE - The House resumed debate on H. Res. 478. |
2017-07-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 478. |
2017-07-27 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H6480-6491) |
2017-07-26 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 69. |
2017-07-26 | House | The resolution provides for further consideration of H.R. 3219, under a structured rule. The resolution makes in order only those further amendments printed in Part B of the report. Also the resolution provides that it shall be in order at any time on the legislative day of July 27, 2017, or July 28, 2017, for the Speaker to entertain motions to suspend the rules. |
2017-07-26 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-261, by Mr. Newhouse. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3219 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 187.