US HR471 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-17-1)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the heartfelt condolences of the House of Representatives to the families and friends of the victims of the May 11, 2009, shooting at the combat stress clinic at Camp Liberty, Iraq. Conveys its ongoing deep gratitude to the brave members of the Armed Forces who risk their lives in service of protecting the nation. Recognizes the important work of the medical professionals and staff members, who provide essential mental health services to our servicemen and women, at Combat Stress Control Center in Camp Liberty, Iraq, and other clinics in theater and at home. Commits the House to: (1) focus on the mental, in addition to the physical, well-being of the nation's military servicemen and women, and veterans; and (2) support the policies, resources, and funding necessary to combat successfully the mental and physical healthcare challenges that they may confront.
Title
Expressing sympathy to the victims, families, and friends of the tragic act of violence at the combat stress clinic at Camp Liberty, Iraq, on May 11, 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-08 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. | |
2009-06-03 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-03 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 416 - 0 (Roll no. 299). (text: CR 6/2/2009 H6038) | |
2009-06-03 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6123-6124) | |
2009-06-02 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Kratovil objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2009-06-02 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 471. | |
2009-06-02 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6038-6040) | |
2009-06-02 | Mr. Kratovil moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Crime victims
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Iraq
Mental health
Middle East
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Violent crime