US HR460 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requesting the Secretary of the Interior to recognize the rich history of the logging industry and the importance of lumberjack sports by adding the Lumberjack Bowl to the National Register of Historic Places. Requests that the Department of the Interior add the Lumberjack Bowl, the site of the Lumberjack World Championships, to the National Register of Historic Places.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting the Secretary of the Interior to recognize the rich history of the logging industry and the importance of lumberjack sports by adding the Lumberjack Bowl to the National Register of Historic Places.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-25HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H8861-8862)
2018-09-25HouseH.Amdt.967 On agreeing to the McClintock amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
2018-09-25HouseH.Amdt.967 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. McClintock. (consideration: CR H8862; text: CR H8862)
2018-09-25HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8861-8862)
2018-09-25HouseCommittee on Natural Resources discharged.
2018-09-25HouseMr. McClintock asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2018-09-05HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2018-09-05HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2018-09-05HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2017-07-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-07-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-07-19HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback