US HR455 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of National Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month and National Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day. The resolution supports (1) the education of members of the Armed Forces, veterans, their families, and the public about post-traumatic stress injury; and (2) efforts by the Department of Veterans Affairs and the Department of Defense to foster cultural change around the issue of post-traumatic stress injury. The resolution also encourages officers of the Armed Forces to support treatment of members of the Armed Forces who suffer from post-traumatic stress injury.
Title
Expressing support for the designation of the month of June 2019 as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month" and June 27, 2019, as "National Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR220 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
SR618 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/15/2020 CR S2975-2976)
HR1006 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SR618 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/15/2020 CR S2975-2976)
HR1006 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Department of Veterans Affairs
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Neurological disorders
Veterans' medical care
Commemorative events and holidays
Department of Veterans Affairs
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health promotion and preventive care
Mental health
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Neurological disorders
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/455/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres455/BILLS-116hres455ih.pdf |