US HR438 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the designation of a National Child Awareness Month to promote awareness of children's charities and youth-serving organizations across the United States.
Title
Expressing support for designation of September as "National Child Awareness Month".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-05-18 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5685) | |
2009-05-18 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 438. | |
2009-05-18 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5685-5686) | |
2009-05-18 | Mr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1219 (Related) 2010-07-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR598 (Related) 2010-07-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6456; text as passed Senate: CR S6456; text of measure as introduced: CR S6442)
SR598 (Related) 2010-07-28 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6456; text as passed Senate: CR S6456; text of measure as introduced: CR S6442)
Subjects
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations