US HR412 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-10 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 186 (Roll no. 491). (text: CR H5882)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-10 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 186 (Roll no. 491). (text: CR H5882)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 411) finding that the President has not complied with section 2 of the Iran Nuclear Agreement Review Act of 2015; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3461) to approve the Joint Comprehensive Plan of Action, signed at Vienna on July 14, 2015, relating to the nuclear program of Iran; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3460) to suspend until January 21, 2017, the authority of the President to waive, suspend, reduce, provide relief from, or otherwise limit the application of sanctions pursuant to an agreement related to the nuclear program of Iran. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 411) finding that the President has not complied with section 2 of the Iran Nuclear Agreement Review Act of 2015; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3461) to approve the Joint Comprehensive Plan of Action, signed at Vienna on July 14, 2015, relating to the nuclear program of Iran; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3460) to suspend until January 21, 2017, the authority of the President to waive, suspend, reduce, provide relief from, or otherwise limit the application of sanctions pursuant to an agreement related to the nuclear program of Iran.
Title
Providing for consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 411) finding that the President has not complied with section 2 of the Iran Nuclear Agreement Review Act of 2015; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3461) to approve the Joint Comprehensive Plan of Action, signed at Vienna on July 14, 2015, relating to the nuclear program of Iran; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3460) to suspend until January 21, 2017, the authority of the President to waive, suspend, reduce, provide relief from, or otherwise limit the application of sanctions pursuant to an agreement related to the nuclear program of Iran.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 243 N: 186 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 245 N: 186 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 245 N: 186 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-10 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 186 (Roll no. 491). (text: CR H5882) |
2015-09-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-09-10 | House | The previous question was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H5890) |
2015-09-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 412. |
2015-09-10 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5882-5891) |
2015-09-09 | House | Resolution provides for consideration of 3 measures: H. Res. 411; H.R.3460; and H.R. 3461. |
2015-09-09 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 57. |
2015-09-09 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 114-259, by Mr. Sessions. |
Same As/Similar To
HR411 (Related) 2015-09-10 - On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 245 - 186 (Roll no. 492). (text: CR H5891-5892)
HB3460 (Related) 2016-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB3461 (Related) 2015-09-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3460 (Related) 2016-07-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB3461 (Related) 2015-09-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.