US HR407 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-3)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Condemning the persecution of Christians around the world. Condemns all violations of religious freedom and affirms that religious freedom is a fundamental right of every individual that should never be arbitrarily abridged by any government. Condemns the persecution of Christians around the world. Calls on discriminatory countries to cease their persecution of Christians and religious minorities and combat religious persecution carried out by extremist non-state actors. Urges the President and the heads of the governments of all countries to uphold the right to religious freedom and condemn the persecution of Christians and other religious minorities.
Title
Condemning the persecution of Christians around the world.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] |
Rep. Thomas Garrett [R-VA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Ron DeSantis [R-FL] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] |
Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] |
Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] |
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-12-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9821) |
2017-12-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 407. |
2017-12-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9821-9824) |
2017-12-12 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2017-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2017-06-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-06-26 | House | Introduced in House |