US HR40 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 78) to improve the consideration by the Securities and Exchange Commission of the costs and benefits of its regulations and orders; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 238) to reauthorize the Commodity Futures Trading Commission, to better protect futures customers, to provide end-users with market certainty, to make basic reforms to ensure transparency and accountability at the Commission, to help farmers, ranchers, and end-users manage risks, to help keep consumer costs low, and for other purposes; and for other purposes. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 78) to improve the consideration by the Securities and Exchange Commission of the costs and benefits of its regulations and orders; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 238) to reauthorize the Commodity Futures Trading Commission, to better protect futures customers, to provide end-users with market certainty, to make basic reforms to ensure transparency and accountability at the Commission, to help farmers, ranchers, and end-users manage risks, to help keep consumer costs low, and for other purposes.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 78) to improve the consideration by the Securities and Exchange Commission of the costs and benefits of its regulations and orders; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 238) to reauthorize the Commodity Futures Trading Commission, to better protect futures customers, to provide end-users with market certainty, to make basic reforms to ensure transparency and accountability at the Commission, to help farmers, ranchers, and end-users manage risks, to help keep consumer costs low, and for other purposes; and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-11 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 32 (Y: 232 N: 168 NV: 34 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 33 (Y: 233 N: 170 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 33 (Y: 233 N: 170 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-11 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 233 - 170 (Roll no. 33). (text: CR H316) |
2017-01-11 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 168 (Roll no. 32). (consideration: CR H321-322) |
2017-01-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 40. |
2017-01-11 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H316-322) |
2017-01-10 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 3. |
2017-01-10 | House | The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on both H.R. 78 and H.R. 238. The resolution provides for suspension authority at any time on the legislative day of January 13, 2017. The resolution also provides for legislative proceedings during the period of January |
2017-01-10 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-3, by Mr. Newhouse. |
Same As/Similar To
HB78 (Related) 2017-01-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB238 (Related) 2017-01-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
HB238 (Related) 2017-01-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.