US HR39 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 325) to ensure the complete and timely payment of the obligations of the United States Government until May 19, 2013.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 325) to ensure the complete and timely payment of the obligations of the United States Government until May 19, 2013, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-23 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 234 N: 190 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 232 N: 193 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 232 N: 193 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-01-23 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 234 - 190 (Roll no. 27). (text: CR H227) |
2013-01-23 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 232 - 193 (Roll no. 26). (consideration: CR H235) |
2013-01-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 39. |
2013-01-23 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H227-236) |
2013-01-22 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 2. |
2013-01-22 | House | The resolution waives all points of order against consideration of the bill. The resolution provides that the amendment printed in the report shall be considered as adopted and the bill, as amended shall be considered as read. The resolution waives all points of order against provisions in the bill, as amended. |
2013-01-22 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 113-2, by Mr. Sessions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB325 (Related) 2013-02-04 - Became Public Law No: 113-3.