US HR388 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulating and honoring Fermi National Accelerator Laboratory on 50 years of groundbreaking discoveries. Congratulates and honors the Fermi National Accelerator Laboratory (Fermilab) on its semicentennial. Wishes Fermilab success in continuing to help the people of the United States understand the mysteries of matter, energy, space, and time.
Title
Congratulating and honoring Fermi National Accelerator Laboratory on 50 years of groundbreaking discoveries.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2017-06-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR169 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3020)
SR187 (Same As) 2017-06-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3343; text as passed Senate: CR S3339)
SR187 (Same As) 2017-06-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3343; text as passed Senate: CR S3339)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Energy research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Illinois
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Congressional tributes
Energy research
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Illinois
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/388/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres388/BILLS-115hres388ih.pdf |