US HR382 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the goals and ideals of the 10th annual National Charter Schools Week. Acknowledges and commends charter schools and their students, parents, teachers, and administrators across the country for their ongoing contributions to education and the public school system.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Charter Schools Week, to be held May 3 through May 9, 2009.
Sponsors
Rep. Michele Bachmann [R-MN] | Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. John Boehner [R-OH] |
Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Anh Cao [R-LA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Rep. Michael Castle [R-DE] |
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Vernon Ehlers [R-MI] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
Rep. Peter Hoekstra [R-MI] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] |
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Betsy Markey [D-CO] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Howard McKeon [R-CA] |
Rep. George Miller [D-CA] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [R-PA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] |
Rep. Thomas Perriello [D-VA] | Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. | |
2009-05-05 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-05-05 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5114) | |
2009-05-05 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 382. | |
2009-05-05 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5114-5116) | |
2009-05-05 | Mr. Polis (CO) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1149 (Related) 2010-05-05 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula