US HR374 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the designation of "ALS Awareness Month".
Title
Supports the designation of "ALS Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] |
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] |
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Maxwell Frost [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR224 (Related) 2023-05-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1752-1753)
SR239 (Related) 2023-06-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2011; text: CR S2009-2010)
SR239 (Related) 2023-06-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2011; text: CR S2009-2010)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/374/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres374/BILLS-118hres374ih.pdf |