US HR36 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 191-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-23 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H253-256)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes in the House of Representatives a select Committee to investigate and report to the House on: any intelligence known to the United States relating to the attack on the U.S. consulate in Benghazi, Libya, on September 11, 2012; any requests for additional security, or actions taken by federal agencies to improve security at the consulate before the attack; a definitive timeline of it; how the relevant agencies and the executive branch responded to it and whether appropriate congressional notifications were made; any improper conduct by officials relating to the attack; recommendations on what steps Congress and the President should take to prevent future attacks; and any other relevant issues relating to the attack or the response to it.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a select committee to investigate and report on the attack on the United States consulate in Benghazi, Libya.

Sponsors

Rep. Frank Wolf [R]Rep. Robert Aderholt [R]Rep. Rodney Alexander [R]Rep. Justin Amash [R]
Rep. Mark Amodei [R]Rep. Michele Bachmann [R]Rep. Spencer Bachus [R]Rep. Lou Barletta [R]
Rep. Garland Barr [R]Rep. Joe Barton [R]Rep. Dan Benishek [R]Rep. Kerry Bentivolio [R]
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R]Rep. Rob Bishop [R]Rep. Diane Black [R]Rep. Marsha Blackburn [R]
Rep. Jo Bonner [R]Rep. Charles Boustany [R]Rep. Kevin Brady [R]Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R]
Rep. Mo Brooks [R]Rep. Susan Brooks [R]Rep. Paul Broun [R]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R]
Rep. Michael Burgess [R]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R]Rep. Ken Calvert [R]Rep. John Campbell [R]
Sen. Shelley Capito [R]Rep. John Carter [R]Sen. Bill Cassidy [R]Rep. Steve Chabot [R]
Rep. Mike Coffman [R]Rep. Tom Cole [R]Rep. Chris Collins [R]Rep. Doug Collins [R]
Rep. Paul Cook [R]Sen. Tom Cotton [R]Rep. Kevin Cramer [R]Rep. Eric Crawford [R]
Rep. Ander Crenshaw [R]Rep. John Culberson [R]Sen. Steve Daines [R]Rep. Jeff Denham [R]
Rep. Charles Dent [R]Rep. Ron DeSantis [R]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R]
Rep. Sean Duffy [R]Rep. Jeff Duncan [R]Rep. John Duncan [R]Rep. Blake Farenthold [R]
Rep. Stephen Fincher [R]Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R]Rep. John Fleming [R]
Rep. Bill Flores [R]Rep. Randy Forbes [R]Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R]Rep. Trent Franks [R]
Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R]Sen. Cory Gardner [R]Rep. Scott Garrett [R]Rep. Jim Gerlach [R]
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R]Rep. Christopher Gibson [R]Rep. Phil Gingrey [R]Rep. Louie Gohmert [R]
Rep. Paul Gosar [R]Rep. Trey Gowdy [R]Rep. Kay Granger [R]Rep. Sam Graves [R]
Rep. Tom Graves [R]Rep. Tim Griffin [R]Rep. Morgan Griffith [R]Rep. Michael Grimm [R]
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R]Rep. Ralph Hall [R]Rep. Richard Hanna [R]Rep. Andy Harris [R]
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R]Rep. Joseph Heck [R]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R]Rep. George Holding [R]
Rep. Richard Hudson [R]Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R]Rep. Randy Hultgren [R]
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R]Rep. Robert Hurt [R]Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R]Rep. Bill Johnson [R]
Rep. Sam Johnson [R]Rep. Walter Jones [R]Rep. Jim Jordan [R]Rep. David Joyce [R]
Rep. Peter King [R]Rep. Steve King [R]Rep. Jack Kingston [R]Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R]
Rep. Raul Labrador [R]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R]Rep. Leonard Lance [R]
Rep. Tom Latham [R]Rep. Robert Latta [R]Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R]Rep. Frank Lucas [R]
Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R]Rep. Kenny Marchant [R]Rep. Tom Marino [R]Rep. Thomas Massie [R]
Rep. Vance McAllister [R]Rep. Michael McCaul [R]Rep. Tom McClintock [R]Rep. David McKinley [R]
Rep. Mark Meadows [R]Rep. Patrick Meehan [R]Rep. Luke Messer [R]Rep. Candice Miller [R]
Rep. Gary Miller [R]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R]Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R]Rep. Tim Murphy [R]
Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R]Rep. Kristi Noem [R]Rep. Richard Nugent [R]Rep. Alan Nunnelee [R]
Rep. Pete Olson [R]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R]Rep. Erik Paulsen [R]Rep. Stevan Pearce [R]
Rep. Scott Perry [R]Rep. Thomas Petri [R]Rep. Robert Pittenger [R]Rep. Joseph Pitts [R]
Rep. Ted Poe [R]Rep. Bill Posey [R]Rep. Tom Price [R]Rep. Tom Reed [R]
Rep. David Reichert [R]Rep. James Renacci [R]Rep. Reid Ribble [R]Rep. Tom Rice [R]
Rep. Scott Rigell [R]Rep. Martha Roby [R]Rep. David Roe [R]Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R]
Rep. Dana Rohrabacher [R]Rep. Todd Rokita [R]Rep. Thomas Rooney [R]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D]
Rep. Dennis Ross [R]Rep. Keith Rothfus [R]Rep. Jon Runyan [R]Rep. Matt Salmon [R]
Rep. Mark Sanford [R]Rep. Steve Scalise [R]Rep. Aaron Schock [R]Rep. David Schweikert [R]
Rep. Austin Scott [R]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R]Rep. John Shimkus [R]Rep. Bill Shuster [R]
Rep. Michael Simpson [R]Rep. Christopher Smith [R]Rep. Jason Smith [R]Rep. Lamar Smith [R]
Rep. Steve Southerland [R]Rep. Chris Stewart [R]Rep. Steve Stivers [R]Rep. Steve Stockman [R]
Rep. Marlin Stutzman [R]Rep. Lee Terry [R]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R]Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R]
Rep. Scott Tipton [R]Rep. Ann Wagner [R]Rep. Tim Walberg [R]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R]
Rep. Randy Weber [R]Rep. Daniel Webster [R]Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R]Rep. Ed Whitfield [R]
Rep. Roger Williams [R]Rep. Joe Wilson [R]Rep. Robert Wittman [R]Rep. Steve Womack [R]
Rep. Kevin Yoder [R]Rep. Ted Yoho [R]Rep. C.W. Young [R]Rep. Don Young [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-23HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H253-256)
2013-01-18HouseReferred to the House Committee on Rules.
2013-01-18HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E41-42)

Same As/Similar To

HR306 (Related) 2013-07-30 - Motion to Discharge Committee filed by Mr. Stockman. Petition No: 113-4. ( ">Discharge petition text with signatures.)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback