US HR352 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1973) to prevent the sexual abuse of minors and amateur athletes by requiring the prompt reporting of sexual abuse to law enforcement authorities, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1761) to amend title 18, United States Code, to criminalize the knowing consent of the visual depiction, or live transmission, of a minor engaged in sexually explicit conduct, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from May 26, 2017, through June 5, 2017. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1973) to prevent the sexual abuse of minors and amateur athletes by requiring the prompt reporting of sexual abuse to law enforcement authorities, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1761) to amend title 18, United States Code, to criminalize the knowing consent of the visual depiction, or live transmission, of a minor engaged in sexually explicit conduct, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from May 26, 2017, through June 5, 2017.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1973) to prevent the sexual abuse of minors and amateur athletes by requiring the prompt reporting of sexual abuse to law enforcement authorities, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 1761) to amend title 18, United States Code, to criminalize the knowing consent of the visual depiction, or live transmission, of a minor engaged in sexually explicit conduct, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from May 26, 2017, through June 5, 2017.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 275 (Y: 231 N: 188 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 276 (Y: 239 N: 179 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 276 (Y: 239 N: 179 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-05-24 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 239 - 179 (Roll no. 276). (text: CR H4520-4521) |
2017-05-24 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 188 (Roll no. 275). (consideration: CR H4525) |
2017-05-24 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4525-4527) |
2017-05-24 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 352, the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Slaughter demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of ordering the previous question until later in the legislative day. |
2017-05-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 352. |
2017-05-24 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4520-4523) |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 52. |
2017-05-23 | House | The resolution provides for one hour of general debate on H.R. 1973 and H.R. 1761. The resolution provides for proceedings during the period from May 26, 2017 through June 5, 2017. |
2017-05-23 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-152, by Mr. Buck. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1761 (Related) 2017-06-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1973 (Related) 2017-06-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1973 (Related) 2017-06-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.