US HR351 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-21-1)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-27 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Condemning the violence and persecution in Chechnya. Condemns the violence and persecution in Chechnya. Calls on: Chechen officials to cease the abduction, detention, and torture of individuals on the basis of their sexual orientation and hold accountable those involved in perpetrating such abuses; the government of the Russian Federation to protect the human rights of all its citizens, condemn the violence and persecution, investigate such crimes in Chechnya, and hold accountable those involved in perpetrating such abuses; and the U.S. government to continue to condemn the violence and persecution in Chechnya, demand the release of individuals wrongfully detained, and identify those individuals whose involvement in this violence qualifies for the imposition of sanctions under the Sergei Magnitsky Rule of Law Accountability Act of 2012 or the Global Magnitsky Human Rights Accountability Act. Affirms that the rights to freedom of assembly, association, and expression and freedom from extrajudicial detention and violence are universal human rights and that countries that fail to respect these rights jeopardize the security and prosperity of all their citizens.
Title
Condemning the violence and persecution in Chechnya.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5214) |
2017-06-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 351. |
2017-06-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5214-5217) |
2017-06-27 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2017-05-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR211 (Related) 2017-10-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6878; text: CR S6878)
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
Russia
Sanctions
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Visas and passports
Detention of persons
Foreign property
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
Russia
Sanctions
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Visas and passports