US HR348 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-18)
Status: Introduced on July 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the right of the people of Ukraine to freely elect their government and determine their future. Supports the right of the people of Ukraine to freely elect their government and determine their future. Urges the Administration to expedite assistance to Ukraine to facilitate the political, economic, and social reforms necessary for elections that meet international standards. Condemns outside attempts, specifically by the government of Russia, its agents or supporters, to interfere in Ukraine's elections.
Title
Supporting the right of the people of Ukraine to freely elect their government and determine their future.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-20 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree, as Amended (Y: 413 N: 4 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-10-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 4 (Roll no. 552). (text: CR H7007) |
2015-10-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7011-7012) |
2015-10-20 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-10-20 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 348. |
2015-10-20 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7007-7009) |
2015-10-20 | House | Mr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2015-10-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-10-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-10-07 | House | Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats Discharged. |
2015-08-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats. |
2015-07-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2015-07-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Ukraine
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Ukraine