US HR322 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 367) to amend chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, to provide that major rules of the executive branch shall have no force or effect unless a joint resolution of approval is enacted into law; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2009) to prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from enforcing the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010; providing for proceedings during the period from August 3, 2013, through September 6, 2013; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2879) to provide limitations on bonuses for Federal employees during sequestration, to provide for investigative leave requirements for members of the Senior Executive Service, to establish certain procedures for conducting in-person or telephonic interactions by Executive branch employees with individuals.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 367) to amend chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, to provide that major rules of the executive branch shall have no force or effect unless a joint resolution of approval is enacted into law; providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2009) to prohibit the Secretary of the Treasury from enforcing the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010; providing for proceedings during the period from August 3, 2013, through September 6, 2013; and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 2879) to provide limitations on bonuses for Federal employees during sequestration, to provide for investigative leave requirements for members of the Senior Executive Service, to establish certain procedures for conducting in-person or telephonic interactions by Executive branch employees with individuals, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-01 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 223 N: 189 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-01 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 222 N: 191 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-01 - House - On Ordering the Previous Question (Y: 222 N: 191 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-08-01 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 223 - 189 (Roll no. 434). (text: CR H5276-5277) |
2013-08-01 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 191 (Roll no. 433). (consideration: CR H5293-5294) |
2013-08-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5293-5294) |
2013-08-01 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At conclusion of debate on H.Res. 322 the Chair put the question on ordering the previous question and by voice vote, announced that the ayes prevailed. Ms. Slaughter demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of ordering the previous question until later in the legislative day. |
2013-08-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 322. |
2013-08-01 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H5276-5285) |
2013-07-31 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 49. |
2013-07-31 | House | In each case the rule provides for one hour of debate on the bill and one motion to recommit for each bill. |
2013-07-31 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 113-187, by Mr. Cole. |
Same As/Similar To
HB367 (Related) 2013-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2009 (Related) 2013-09-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 192.
HB2879 (Related) 2013-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HR292 (Similar To) 2013-08-01 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 322, H. Res. 292 is laid on the table.
HB1541 (Similar To) 2013-08-01 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 322, H.R. 1541 is laid on the table.
HB2579 (Similar To) 2013-08-01 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 322, H.R. 2579 is laid on the table.
HB2711 (Similar To) 2013-08-01 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 322, H.R. 2711 is laid on the table.
HB2009 (Related) 2013-09-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 192.
HB2879 (Related) 2013-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HR292 (Similar To) 2013-08-01 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 322, H. Res. 292 is laid on the table.
HB1541 (Similar To) 2013-08-01 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 322, H.R. 1541 is laid on the table.
HB2579 (Similar To) 2013-08-01 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 322, H.R. 2579 is laid on the table.
HB2711 (Similar To) 2013-08-01 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 322, H.R. 2711 is laid on the table.